+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Public Safety
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor