+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On May 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 17, 2007, 6:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 155 NOES: 1
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Perfected
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Homeland Security
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor