+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Utilities
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1, HCA 2 and HCA 3 AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Energy and the Environment
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
0502H01.05H
Distributed
0502H01.03H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor