+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled