+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, May 6, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Education
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 135 NOES: 19 PRESENT: 0
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Education
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1, HCA 1 TO HCA 2, HCA 2 AS AMENDED AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues in Education
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
1300H01.07H
Distributed
1300H01.06H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor