+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
- Constitutional Objection Filed
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- House Message
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 151 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- House Concurs - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 8 AYES: 151 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 8
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2,SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 8 AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 28, 9:00 a.m., Joint Committee Room
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 8, Adopted
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - 2:00 p.m., Monday, March 22, 2021, Senate Lounge
- Second read and referred: Professional Registration
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 14, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (9)
0923H01.13S
Adopted
0923H01.15S
Adopted
0923H01.16S
Out of Order
0923H01.03S
Adopted
0923H01.01S
Adopted
0923H01.11S
Adopted
0923H01.07S
Adopted
0923H01.08S
Adopted
0923H01.01F
Distributed