+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Not Pass - AYES: 3 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Do Pass Failed
- Executive Session Completed
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Student Accountability
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled