+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 1, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 126 NOES: 17
- House Concurs - SS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 120 NOES: 22
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1 ADOPTED/SCS, SS/SCS, SA 2 PENDING
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 26, 2011, 12:30PM, PERSHING SIDE GALLERY
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: General Laws
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 15
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Laid Over - HCS PENDING
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Tax Reform
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor