+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 30, 2013, 1:00PM, SCR 1
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate General Laws
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 105 NOES: 47
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Laid Over - HA 1 ADOPTED
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- Reported Do Pass
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Read First Time
- Read First Time
On December 6, 2012 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor