+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 4, 2007. 1:30PM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Education
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 12
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
- Read Second Time
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor