+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 8, 2015, noon or upon morning adjournment, Senate Lounge
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 106 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Perfected
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Commerce
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor