+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Motion to Do Pass Failed
- Executive Session Completed
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Refer: Spec Stand Com on Pro. Registration & Licensing
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (96)
Type:
Primary Sponsor