+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 15, 2013, UPON EVENING RECESS OR ADJOURNMENT, SENATE LOUNGE
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 116 NOES: 41
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted - AYES: 118 NOES: 42
- Perfected - AYES: 118 NOES: 42
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor