+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 6, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday April 29, 2015, 2:00 p.m., Senate Lounge.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Education
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 ADOPTED
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Education
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues in Education
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
1007H02.01H
Adopted
1007L01.02L
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor