+ − Actions (9)
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Laid Over
On March 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- Motion to Table Adopted - PART 1 OF HA 2 TO HA 2 ADOPTED/HA 2 AS AMENDED TABLED
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 15, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 14, 2001 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On March 7, 2001 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 8, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Education-Elementary and Secondary
On January 23, 2001 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2001 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor