+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Reported Do Pass
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, MARCH 27, 2007, 8:15AM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1. POSSIBLE EXECUTIVE SESSION
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Seniors, Families & Public Health
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 11
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Perfected
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Senior Citizen Advocacy
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (79)
Type:
Primary Sponsor