+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 156 NOES: 0
- House Concurs - SS ADOPTED AYES: 156 NOES: 0
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- SS Adopted
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 0
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SS, SA 2 PENDING
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On March 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - THURSDAY, MARCH 29, 2007, 8:30AM, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 0
- Reported Do Pass
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 5 ADOPTED
- HCS Adopted
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Senior Citizen Advocacy
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (104)
Type:
Primary Sponsor