+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 120 NOES: 30
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 134 NOES: 16
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Vote to Reconsider
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Referred: Rules
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor