+ − Actions (15)
On May 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On May 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Local Government & Economic Development
On April 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 26, 2001 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 000
On April 25, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
On April 24, 2001 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 3, HA 4 ADOPTED
On March 15, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On February 27, 2001 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 8, 2001 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government and Related Matters
On January 22, 2001 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 18, 2001 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor