+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (59)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- House Message
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- House Adopts - SS adopted AYES: 143 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Voted Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS SCS
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 8, 2021, 8:15am, SCR 1
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
- SS Adopted
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 1, 8:15 am, SCR 1
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, March 4, 2021, Senate Lounge, 8:00am
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Thursday, February 25, 2021. 8:30am, Senate Lounge
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Ways and Means
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 155 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 10, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled