+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Tax Reform
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor