+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, HA 4 adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 14 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (12)
0589H03.18H
Defeated
0589H03.17H
Distributed
0589H03.16H
Defeated
0589H03.15H
Distributed
0589H03.14H
Withdrawn
0589H03.13H
Distributed
0589H03.11H
Defeated
0589H03.10H
Distributed
0589H03.08H
Adopted
0589H03.06H
Adopted
0589H03.05H
Distributed
0589H03.04H
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor