+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time