+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor