+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Urban Issues
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time