+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 30, 2005 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2005 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0
On April 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On March 30, 2005 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Aging,Families, Mental & Public Health
On March 29, 2005 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 11
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 144 NOES: 10
On March 29, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 17, 2005 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent - NO TIME LIMIT FOR DEBATE
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 28, 2005 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 1, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor