+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
On April 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 14, 2005 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 126 NOES: 28 PRESENT: 2
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- Perfected
On March 17, 2005 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - NO TIME LIMIT FOR DEBATE
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 1, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor