+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Insurance Policy
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor