+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 125 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 8
- Taken Up
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Tourism
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 27, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
0893H01.03H
Returned
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor