+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 2, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor