+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 26, 2011, 12:30PM, PERSHING SIDE GALLERY
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: General Laws
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 150 NOES: 0
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor