+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 15 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Agriculture Policy
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled