+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Small Business
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time