+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Laid Over - HCS PENDING
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- 2/05/2009
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Spec Standing Committee on Children & Families
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor