+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 136 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Title of Bill - Agreed To - Judicial proceedings
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, HA 4 adopted
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled