+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled