+ − Actions (18)
On July 9, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 0
On April 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Aging,Families, Mental & Public Health
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 158 NOES: 0
On March 10, 2003 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Referred: Health Care Policy
- Read Second Time
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor