+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - NO ACTION TAKEN
On February 28, 2005 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor