+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 24, 2013, Upon Adjournment, Senate Lounge
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Monday, April 22, 2013, Upon Evening Recess or Adjournment, Senate Lounge
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled - Monday, April 22, 2013 cancelled.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 95 NOES: 55
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor