+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight
On May 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, MAY 4, 2011, 12:00 P.M., SCR 2
- Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 136 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 1
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Executive Session - No Action Taken
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Laid Over - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 ADOPTED/HCS AS AMENDED PENDING
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 ADOPTED
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred: Economic Development
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor