+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to Reconsider Adopted
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Government Affairs
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time