+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 2, 2007 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Laid Over - HSA 1 FOR HA 1, HA 1 PENDING
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Ways and Means
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time