+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Action Postponed
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 7, 2020 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
0694H03.02H
Distributed
0694H03.01H
Distributed