+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 29, 2009 8:00 A.M. SCR 1
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 4
On April 15, 2009 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 2 ADOPTED
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred: Spec Stand Com on Infrastructure & Trans Fund
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time