+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 24, 2007, 12:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 3, 2007, 12:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Health and Mental Health
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 156 NOES: 2
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 3, HA 4, HA 1 TO HA 6, HA 6 AS AMENDED ADOPTED
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit - TWO HOUR TIME LIMIT FOR DEBATE ON PERFECTION
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Healthcare Facilities
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 11, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (84)
Type:
Primary Sponsor