+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On September 11, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
- Senate Votes to Override Veto - AYES: 26 NOES: 8
- Senate Votes to Override Veto - AYES: 26 NOES: 8
On September 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Message
- House Message
- House Votes to Override Veto - AYES: 109 NOES: 51 PRESENT: 1
- House Votes to Override Veto - AYES: 109 NOES: 51 PRESENT: 1
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 30, 2013, UPON MORNING RECESS OR ADJOURNMENT, SCR 1
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 104 NOES: 55
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Perfected - AYES: 101 NOES: 57
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- Reported Do Pass
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Insurance Policy
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time