+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 9, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred: Fiscal Oversight
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
- Voted Do Pass
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, May 1, 2019, 9:00am, SCR 2
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Seniors, Families and Children
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 122 NOES: 25 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session Continued - Motion to Do Pass Tabled
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Aging
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 19, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
1076H01.03H
Returned