+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - voted do pass
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 9, 2017, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Public Hearing Scheduled
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 120 NOES: 24 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2 adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- HCS Adopted
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred: Utilities
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (10)
0160H03.24H
Distributed
0160H03.23H
Adopted
0160H03.22H
Distributed
0160H03.13H
Distributed
0160H03.14H
Distributed
0160H03.12H
Adopted
0160H03.11H
Distributed
0160H03.10H
Distributed
0160H03.09H
Distributed
0160H03.07H
Distributed