+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 5, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 7
- House Concurs - SS ADOPTED
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 30
- SS Adopted
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 16, 2013, 1:30p.m., Senate Lounge
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 8
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Utilities
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor