+ − Actions (42)
On September 10, 2003 in the House:
- Veto Override Failed - AYES: 91 NOES: 68
On July 9, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 128 NOES: 26 PRESENT: 4
- House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 131 NOES: 27 PRESENT: 1
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 139 NOES: 19 PRESENT: 1
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Substitute
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - YEAS: 29 NAYS: 2
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 31 NAYS: 0
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - YEAS: 28 NAYS: 1
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6, SA 7, SA 8, SA 9, SA 10, SA 11, SA 13, SA 15, SA 16, SA 17 ADOPTED YEAS: 30 NAYS: 0
- Emergency Clause Adopted - YEAS: 28 NAYS: 1
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS DOLAN, STEELMAN, GROSS, STOLL AND MATHEWSON
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES LIPKE, SCHLOTTACH, CRAWFORD, GREEN 15 AND DAUS
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
- Conference Committee Substitute
On May 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 136 NOES: 18 PRESENT: 1
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 157 NOES: 1
On March 10, 2003 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments Consent - HCA 1
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT AS AMENDED
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation and Motor Vehicles
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor